KS S0534 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in committee
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in committee
Summary
Criminal procedure; correctional supervision fees; pretrial supervision fees. Effective date: Statute Bk.
Title
Criminal procedure; correctional supervision fees; pretrial supervision fees. Effective date: Statute Bk.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Died in committee | |
2010-02-19 | Withdrawn from Ways and Means -SJ 1084; Rereferred to Judiciary -SJ 1084 | |
2010-02-18 | Withdrawn from Judiciary -SJ 1082; Referred to Ways and Means -SJ 1082 | |
2010-02-05 | Referred to Judiciary -SJ 993 | |
2010-02-04 | Introduced -SJ 988 |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/legsrv-billtrack/searchBills.do |