KS S0490 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-29 - Rejected by House
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-29 - Rejected by House
Summary
Physical therapists; licensure. Effective date: Statute Bk.
Title
Physical therapists; licensure. Effective date: Statute Bk.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-29 | Rejected by House | |
2010-03-29 | Stricken, House Rule 1507 -HJ 1309 | |
2010-03-12 | CR: Be passed as am. by Health and Human Services -HJ 1106 | |
2010-02-24 | Hearing: Thurs., 3/4/2010, 1:30 PM, Rm 784 Docking | |
2010-02-18 | Referred to Health and Human Services -HJ 963 | |
2010-02-17 | Received and introduced -HJ 951 | |
2010-02-16 | Engrossed -SJ 1036; FA: Passed as am.; Yeas 40 Nays 0 -SJ 1035 | |
2010-02-15 | COW: CR be adptd; be passed as am. -SJ 1027 | |
2010-02-11 | CR: Be passed as am. by Public Health and Welfare -SJ 1020 | |
2010-02-01 | Referred to Public Health and Welfare -SJ 970 | |
2010-01-29 | Introduced -SJ 968 |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/legsrv-billtrack/searchBills.do |