KS S0425 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-29 - Rejected by House
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-29 - Rejected by House
Summary
HouseEmployment security law; contribution rates option; no penalties or interest up to 90 days late. Effective date: KS Register.
Title
HouseEmployment security law; contribution rates option; no penalties or interest up to 90 days late. Effective date: KS Register.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-29 | Rejected by House | |
2010-03-29 | Stricken, House Rule 1507 -HJ 1309 | |
2010-03-08 | CR: Substitute be passed by Commerce and Labor -HJ 1065; Substitute introduced & placed on General Orders -HJ 1065 | |
2010-02-24 | Referred to Commerce and Labor -HJ 1011 | |
2010-02-23 | Received and introduced -HJ 1009 | |
2010-02-23 | Engrossed -SJ 1098 | |
2010-02-19 | COW: CR be adptd; be passed as am. -SJ 1084; EFA: Passed as am.; Yeas 23 Nays 16 -SJ 1095 | |
2010-02-16 | CR: Be passed as am. by Agriculture -SJ 1036 | |
2010-01-25 | Referred to Agriculture -SJ 948 | |
2010-01-22 | Introduced -SJ 944 |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/legsrv-billtrack/searchBills.do |