KS S0380 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-29 - Rejected by House
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-29 - Rejected by House
Summary
Use of public cabins; unlawful acts involving elk. Effective date: Statute Bk.
Title
Use of public cabins; unlawful acts involving elk. Effective date: Statute Bk.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-29 | Rejected by House | |
2010-03-29 | Stricken, House Rule 1507 -HJ 1309 | |
2010-03-19 | CR: Be passed as am. by Agriculture and Natural Resources -HJ 1171 | |
2010-02-24 | Hearing: Tues., 3/2/2010, 3:30 PM, Rm 783 Docking | |
2010-02-12 | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources -HJ 916 | |
2010-02-11 | Received and introduced -HJ 910 | |
2010-02-10 | FA: Passed; Yeas 37 Nays 3 -SJ 1008 | |
2010-02-09 | COW: Be passed -SJ 1002 | |
2010-02-01 | CR: Be passed by Natural Resources -SJ 973 | |
2010-01-15 | Referred to Natural Resources -SJ 926 | |
2010-01-14 | Introduced -SJ 923 |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/legsrv-billtrack/searchBills.do |