KS S0342 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in House committee
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in House committee
Summary
Smoking regulation. Effective date: Statute Bk.
Title
Smoking regulation. Effective date: Statute Bk.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Died in House committee | |
2010-04-29 | Not subject to limitations of joint rule 4(k) -HJ 1394; COW: -HJ 1394; CR rec. Sub bill not adopted -HJ 1394; Be rereferred to Federal and State Affairs -HJ 1394 | |
2010-03-22 | CR: Substitute be passed by Federal and State Affairs -HJ 1217; Substitute introduced & placed on General Orders -HJ 1217 | |
2010-02-15 | Referred to Federal and State Affairs -HJ 922 | |
2010-02-12 | Received and introduced -HJ 921 | |
2010-02-11 | COW: Be passed -SJ 1020; EFA: Passed; Yeas 32 Nays 8 -SJ 1020 | |
2010-02-04 | CR: Be passed by Federal and State Affairs -SJ 990 | |
2010-01-11 | Introduced -SJ 909; Referred to Federal and State Affairs -SJ 910 | |
2010-01-04 | Prefiled for introduction |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/legsrv-billtrack/searchBills.do |