KS S0325 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in committee
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in committee
Summary
Employment security law; allows alternate base periods and benefits for individuals forced to leave employment to care for ill or disabled family member. Effective date: 1/01/2010 & St Bk.
Title
Employment security law; allows alternate base periods and benefits for individuals forced to leave employment to care for ill or disabled family member. Effective date: 1/01/2010 & St Bk.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Died in committee | |
2010-01-15 | Withdrawn from Commerce -SJ 926; Referred to Business and Labor -SJ 926 | |
2009-03-18 | Referred to Commerce -SJ 340 | |
2009-03-17 | Introduced -SJ 337 |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/legsrv-billtrack/searchBills.do |