KS S0270 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in committee
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in committee
Summary
Individual district options to consolidate community corrections and court services. Effective date: Statute Bk.
Title
Individual district options to consolidate community corrections and court services. Effective date: Statute Bk.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Died in committee | |
2009-02-25 | Hearing: 3/02/2009, Mon., 9:30 am, Rm 545-N | |
2009-02-13 | Referred to Judiciary -SJ 177 | |
2009-02-12 | Introduced -SJ 148 |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/legsrv-billtrack/searchBills.do |