KS S0026 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-29 - Rejected by House
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-29 - Rejected by House
Summary
H Sub for S 26 by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice- Increasing traffic fines to fund increases in alcohol and drug therapy program for DUI offenders. Effective date: Statute Bk.
Title
H Sub for S 26 by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice- Increasing traffic fines to fund increases in alcohol and drug therapy program for DUI offenders. Effective date: Statute Bk.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-29 | Rejected by House | |
2010-03-29 | Stricken, House Rule 1507 -HJ 1309 | |
2010-03-10 | CR: Substitute be passed by Corrections and Juvenile Justice -HJ 1081; Substitute introduced & placed on General Orders -HJ 1081 | |
2010-03-05 | Hearing: Mon., 3/8/2010, 1:30 PM, Rm 144-S | |
2009-02-13 | Referred to Corrections and Juvenile Justice -HJ 163 | |
2009-02-12 | Received and introduced -HJ 153 | |
2009-02-11 | Engrossed -SJ 146 | |
2009-02-10 | COW: CR be adptd; be passed as am. -SJ 141; EFA: Passed as am.; Yeas 33 Nays 6 -SJ 141 | |
2009-02-03 | CR: Be passed as am. by Judiciary -SJ 109 | |
2009-01-15 | Referred to Judiciary -SJ 43 | |
2009-01-14 | Introduced -SJ 38 |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/legsrv-billtrack/searchBills.do |