KS HR6014 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 19-4)
Status: Passed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - House Enrolled on Monday, March 27, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 19-4)
Status: Passed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - House Enrolled on Monday, March 27, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizing the 28th anniversary of sister-state relations between the State of Kansas and Taiwan.
Title
Recognizing the 28th anniversary of sister-state relations between the State of Kansas and Taiwan.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-27 | House | House Enrolled on Monday, March 27, 2017 |
2017-03-20 | House | House Adopted without roll call |
2017-02-21 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/hr6014/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/documents/hr6014_enrolled.pdf |