KS HR6014 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 93-32)
Status: Passed on March 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-29 - Enrolled on Tuesday, March 29, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 93-32)
Status: Passed on March 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-29 - Enrolled on Tuesday, March 29, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION honoring former Kansas representative Dick Wellman.
Title
A RESOLUTION honoring former Kansas representative Dick Wellman.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-29 | Enrolled on Tuesday, March 29, 2011 | |
2011-03-23 | Adopted without roll call | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced |