KS HR6013 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 93-32)
Status: Passed on March 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-21 - Enrolled on Monday, March 21, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 93-32)
Status: Passed on March 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-21 - Enrolled on Monday, March 21, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION in memory of Jim Morrison.
Title
A RESOLUTION in memory of Jim Morrison.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-21 | Enrolled on Monday, March 21, 2011 | |
2011-03-17 | Adopted without roll call | |
2011-03-07 | Introduced |