KS HR6011 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-22 - House Enrolled on Wednesday, February 22, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-22 - House Enrolled on Wednesday, February 22, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Congratulating and commending Ray Lipovac's fifth grade class at Stony Point Elementary School and KC Healthy Kids on their efforts to support healthy kids and communities through the I Am Here program.
Title
Congratulating and commending Ray Lipovac's fifth grade class at Stony Point Elementary School and KC Healthy Kids on their efforts to support healthy kids and communities through the I Am Here program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-22 | House | House Enrolled on Wednesday, February 22, 2017 |
2017-02-17 | House | House Adopted without roll call |
2017-02-13 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/hr6011/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/documents/hr6011_enrolled.pdf |