KS HR6004 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-18 - House Enrolled on Wednesday, January 18, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-18 - House Enrolled on Wednesday, January 18, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Rules of the House of Representatives, permanent rules for the 2017-2018 biennium.
Title
Rules of the House of Representatives, permanent rules for the 2017-2018 biennium.
Sponsors
Rep. Ron Ryckman [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-01-12 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Adopted as amended - Yea: 88 Nay: 35 (Y: 88 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-18 | House | House Enrolled on Wednesday, January 18, 2017 |
2017-01-13 | House | House Engrossed on Thursday, January 12, 2017 |
2017-01-12 | House | House Emergency Final Action - Adopted as amended; Yea: 88 Nay: 35 |
2017-01-12 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be adopted as amended |
2017-01-12 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Ward was adopted |
2017-01-12 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Ward |
2017-01-12 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Ward was rejected |
2017-01-12 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Ward |
2017-01-12 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Highberger was rejected |
2017-01-12 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Highberger |
2017-01-12 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Helgerson was rejected |
2017-01-12 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Helgerson |
2017-01-11 | House | House Committee Report recommending resolution be adopted by |
2017-01-09 | House | House Referred to Committee on Rules and Journal |
2017-01-09 | House | House Introduced |