KS HR6003 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-17 - House Enrolled on Tuesday, January 17, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-17 - House Enrolled on Tuesday, January 17, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Rules of the house of representatives, temporary 2017 session.
Title
Rules of the house of representatives, temporary 2017 session.
Sponsors
Rep. Ron Ryckman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-17 | House | House Enrolled on Tuesday, January 17, 2017 |
2017-01-11 | House | House Engrossed on Tuesday, January 10, 2017 |
2017-01-09 | House | House Adopted without roll call |
2017-01-09 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/hr6003/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/documents/hr6003_enrolled.pdf |