KS HCR5004 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-0)
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-0)
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Proposition to amend section 1 of the Kansas bill of rights regarding equal rights for all human life.
Title
Proposition to amend section 1 of the Kansas bill of rights regarding equal rights for all human life.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | House | House Died in Committee |
2019-03-21 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, March 21, 2019, 9:00 AM Room 346-S |
2019-01-28 | House | House Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2019-01-28 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/hcr5004/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/hcr5004_00_0000.pdf |