KS HCR5003 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-06 - House Enrolled on Thursday, April 06, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-06 - House Enrolled on Thursday, April 06, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Urging congress to propose the regulation freedom amendment to the United States constitution.
Title
Urging congress to propose the regulation freedom amendment to the United States constitution.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Adopted - Yea: 27 Nay: 13 (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House Final Action - Adopted - Yea: 93 Nay: 29 (Y: 93 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House Final Action - Adopted - Yea: 93 Nay: 29 (Y: 93 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-06 | House | House Enrolled on Thursday, April 06, 2017 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Adopted; Yea: 27 Nay: 13 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be adopted |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending resolution be adopted by |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2017-02-15 | House | House Final Action - Adopted; Yea: 93 Nay: 29 |
2017-02-14 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be adopted |
2017-01-31 | House | House Committee Report recommending resolution be adopted by |
2017-01-12 | House | House Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2017-01-12 | House | House Introduced |