KS HB2825 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - House Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - House Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Enacting consumer protection related to hospital price transparency act.
Title
Enacting consumer protection related to hospital price transparency act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | House | House Died on Calendar |
2024-03-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to recommend favorably for passage failed |
2024-03-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Blew was rejected |
2024-03-26 | House | House Representative Tarwater raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled germane. |
2024-03-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Blew |
2024-03-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Sutton was adopted |
2024-03-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Sutton |
2024-03-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Sutton was adopted |
2024-03-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Sutton |
2024-03-21 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Insurance |
2024-03-18 | House | House Hearing: Monday, March 18, 2024, 3:30 PM Room 218-N |
2024-03-12 | House | House Referred to Committee on Insurance |
2024-03-12 | House | House Introduced |