KS HB2714 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 6 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-23 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-23 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Reducing the number of appointed board members on certain insurance-related governing boards and the frequency of meetings of the committee on surety bonds and insurance.
Title
Reducing the number of appointed board members on certain insurance-related governing boards and the frequency of meetings of the committee on surety bonds and insurance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-23 | House | House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507 |
2024-02-20 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Insurance |
2024-02-12 | House | House Hearing: Monday, February 12, 2024, 3:30 PM Room 218-N |
2024-02-06 | House | House Referred to Committee on Insurance |
2024-02-06 | House | House Introduced |