KS HB2690 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-27 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-27 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requirements for school districts to administer certain tests, questionnaires, surveys and examinations under the student data privacy act.
Title
Requirements for school districts to administer certain tests, questionnaires, surveys and examinations under the student data privacy act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-27 | House | House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507 |
2020-02-25 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Education |
2020-02-20 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, February 20, 2020, 1:30 PM Room 218-N |
2020-02-13 | House | House Referred to Committee on Education |
2020-02-13 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/hb2690/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/hb2690_00_0000.pdf |