KS HB2661 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-01 - Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-01 - Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Municipally-owned utilities and rates.
Title
Municipally-owned utilities and rates.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-01 | Died in Committee | |
2012-02-08 | Hearing: Monday, February 13, 2012, 9:00 AM Room 785 Docking | |
2012-02-08 | Referred to Committee on Energy and Utilities | |
2012-02-07 | Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2011_12/measures/hb2661/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2011_12/measures/documents/hb2661_00_0000.pdf |