KS HB2647 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adding a parent's history of committing child sexual abuse to the factors the court shall consider in awarding legal custody, residency and parenting time of a child and creating a rebuttable presumption that it is not in the best interest of the child to have parenting time granted to a parent who is subject to certain sex offender registration requirements.
Title
Adding a parent's history of committing child sexual abuse to the factors the court shall consider in awarding legal custody, residency and parenting time of a child and creating a rebuttable presumption that it is not in the best interest of the child to have parenting time granted to a parent who is subject to certain sex offender registration requirements.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | House | House Died in Committee |
2022-02-14 | House | House Hearing: Monday, February 14, 2022, 3:30 PM Room 582-N - CANCELED |
2022-02-08 | House | House Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2022-02-08 | House | House Introduced |