KS HB2634 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-01 - Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-01 - Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Substitute HB 2634 by Committee on Education -- School employee performance and evaluation; professional development.
Title
Substitute HB 2634 by Committee on Education -- School employee performance and evaluation; professional development.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-16 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 94 Nay: 30 (Y: 94 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-01 | Died in Senate Committee | |
2012-03-20 | Referred to Committee on Education | |
2012-03-19 | Received and Introduced | |
2012-03-16 | Engrossed on Friday, 16 March 2012 | |
2012-03-16 | Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 94 Nay: 30 | |
2012-03-15 | Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed as amended | |
2012-03-15 | Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Aurand was adopted | |
2012-03-15 | Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Aurand | |
2012-03-15 | Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed | |
2012-03-12 | Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Education | |
2012-03-01 | Withdrawn from Committee on Education Budget; Rereferred to Committee on Education | |
2012-02-29 | Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Referred to Committee on Education Budget | |
2012-02-22 | Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2012-02-22 | Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Education | |
2012-02-07 | Hearing: Thursday, February 09, 2012, 9:00 AM Room 784 Docking | |
2012-02-07 | Referred to Committee on Education | |
2012-02-06 | Introduced |