KS HB2620 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-6)
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-6)
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creating the crime of interference with the conduct of a hospital, providing criminal penalties for violation thereof and increasing the criminal penalties for battery of a healthcare provider who is employed by a hospital.
Title
Creating the crime of interference with the conduct of a hospital, providing criminal penalties for violation thereof and increasing the criminal penalties for battery of a healthcare provider who is employed by a hospital.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | House | House Died in Committee |
2022-02-23 | House | House Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Calendar and Printing |
2022-02-16 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary |
2022-02-10 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, February 10, 2022, 3:30 PM Room 582-N |
2022-02-08 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice; Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2022-02-07 | House | House Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice |
2022-02-07 | House | House Introduced |