KS HB2595 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - House Approved by Governor on Monday, April 18, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - House Approved by Governor on Monday, April 18, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Making certain antique vehicle titling procedures applicable to vehicles having a model year 60 years old or older.
Title
Making certain antique vehicle titling procedures applicable to vehicles having a model year 60 years old or older.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-31 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 119 Nay: 1 (Y: 119 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 121 Nay: 0 (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 121 Nay: 0 (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-25 | House | House Approved by Governor on Monday, April 18, 2022 |
2022-04-25 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 8, 2022 |
2022-04-01 | House | House Engrossed on Friday, April 1, 2022 |
2022-03-31 | House | House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 119 Nay: 1 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 39 Nay: 0 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Senate Conference committee report now available |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Senate Senator Bowers is appointed to replace Senator Claeys on the Conference Committee |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Senate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Petersen, Senator Claeys and Senator Hawk appointed as conferees |
2022-03-28 | House | House Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Proehl , Representative Delperdang and Representative Helgerson as conferees |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 39 Nay: 0 |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Transportation |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 16, 2022, 8:30 AM Room 546-S |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2022-02-23 | House | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 121 Nay: 0 |
2022-02-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2022-02-17 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Transportation |
2022-02-09 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, February 9, 2022, 1:30 PM Room 582-N |
2022-02-03 | House | House Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2022-02-03 | House | House Introduced |