KS HB2584 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Property taxation; distribution of taxes paid under protest.
Title
Property taxation; distribution of taxes paid under protest.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | House | House Died in Committee |
2018-02-12 | House | House Hearing: Monday, February 12, 2018, 03:30 PM Room 346-S |
2018-01-30 | House | House Referred to Committee on Taxation |
2018-01-30 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/hb2584/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/documents/hb2584_00_0000.pdf |