KS HB2568 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - House Approved by Governor on Thursday, April 7, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - House Approved by Governor on Thursday, April 7, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Amending the Kansas mortgage business act by providing for mortgage business work at remote locations, license and registration renewal or reinstatement procedures, surety bond requirements and evidence of solvency and net worth and requiring notice when adding or closing branch offices.
Title
Amending the Kansas mortgage business act by providing for mortgage business work at remote locations, license and registration renewal or reinstatement procedures, surety bond requirements and evidence of solvency and net worth and requiring notice when adding or closing branch offices.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-23 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 38 Nay: 1 (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 118 Nay: 3 (Y: 118 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 118 Nay: 3 (Y: 118 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-25 | House | House Approved by Governor on Thursday, April 7, 2022 |
2022-03-30 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Wednesday, March 30, 2022 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed; Yea: 38 Nay: 1 |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 9, 2022, 9:30 AM Room 546-S |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2022-02-23 | House | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 118 Nay: 3 |
2022-02-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2022-02-10 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Financial Institutions and Rural Development |
2022-01-31 | House | House Hearing: Monday, January 31, 2022, 9:00 AM Room 218-N |
2022-01-27 | House | House Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Rural Development |
2022-01-27 | House | House Introduced |