KS HB2558 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-05 - House Approved by Governor on Wednesday, April 4, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-05 - House Approved by Governor on Wednesday, April 4, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding the annual game bird hunting season in controlled shooting areas.
Title
Expanding the annual game bird hunting season in controlled shooting areas.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-20 - Senate - Senate Consent Calendar Passed - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 121 Nay: 0 (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 121 Nay: 0 (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-05 | House | House Approved by Governor on Wednesday, April 4, 2018 |
2018-03-26 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Monday, March 26, 2018 |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Senate Consent Calendar Passed Yea: 39 Nay: 0 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Senate Hearing and possible action: Tuesday, March 13, 2018, 08:30 AM Room 159-S |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2018-02-19 | House | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 121 Nay: 0 |
2018-02-13 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by |
2018-02-08 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, February 08, 2018, 03:30 PM Room 582-N |
2018-02-07 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, February 07, 2018, 03:30 PM Room 582-N - CANCELLED |
2018-01-26 | House | House Referred to Committee on Agriculture |
2018-01-26 | House | House Introduced |