KS HB2526 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-2)
Status: Failed on May 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-30 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-2)
Status: Failed on May 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-30 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to the crimes of assault, battery and unlawful interference; creating the crime of unlawful interference with a health care provider.
Title
Relating to the crimes of assault, battery and unlawful interference; creating the crime of unlawful interference with a health care provider.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-30 | House | House Died in Committee |
2014-03-07 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, March 13, 2014, 1:30 PM Room 546-S |
2014-03-05 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Taxation; Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2014-02-28 | House | House Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Taxation |
2014-02-20 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by |
2014-02-07 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, February 12, 2014, 1:30 PM Room 152-S |
2014-01-29 | House | House Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice |
2014-01-29 | House | House Introduced |