KS HB2516 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Senate Died on Senate General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Senate Died on Senate General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring an offender who raises error in such offender's criminal history calculation for the first time on appeal to show prejudicial error and authorizing the court to correct an illegal sentence while a direct appeal is pending.
Title
Requiring an offender who raises error in such offender's criminal history calculation for the first time on appeal to show prejudicial error and authorizing the court to correct an illegal sentence while a direct appeal is pending.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-23 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 121 Nay: 0 (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | Senate | Senate Died on Senate General Orders |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, March 8, 2022, 10:30 AM Room 346-S |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2022-02-23 | House | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 121 Nay: 0 |
2022-02-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2022-02-10 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice |
2022-02-01 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, February 1, 2022, 1:30 PM Room 546-S |
2022-01-20 | House | House Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice |
2022-01-20 | House | House Introduced |