KS HB2512 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-30 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-30 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing the Sedgwick county regional forensic science center to receive forfeited firearms for forensic science purposes.
Title
Allowing the Sedgwick county regional forensic science center to receive forfeited firearms for forensic science purposes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-30 | House | House Died in Committee |
2014-02-14 | House | House Hearing: Monday, February 17, 2014, 1:30 PM Room 152-S |
2014-01-27 | House | House Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice |
2014-01-27 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2013_14/measures/hb2512/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2013_14/measures/documents/hb2512_00_0000.pdf |