KS HB2512 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Substitute for Substitute for HB 2512 by Committee on K-12 Education Budget - Making appropriations for the Kansas state department of education for FY 2022, FY 2023 and FY 2024, establishing requirements relating to academic achievement and third-grade literacy, authorizing credits to be earned through alternative educational opportunities, requiring KSHSAA members and employees to report child abuse and neglect, requiring boards of education of school districts to consider district needs assessments and academic assessments when approving district budgets, authorizing part-time enrollment for certain students, establishing an alternative graduation rate calculation for virtual schools, providing virtual school state aid for credit deficient students and amending the age of initial eligibility for the tax credit for low income students scholarship program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Substitute for Substitute for HB 2512 by Committee on K-12 Education Budget - Making appropriations for the Kansas state department of education for FY 2022, FY 2023 and FY 2024, establishing requirements relating to academic achievement and third-grade literacy, authorizing credits to be earned through alternative educational opportunities, requiring KSHSAA members and employees to report child abuse and neglect, requiring boards of education of school districts to consider district needs assessments and academic assessments when approving district budgets, authorizing part-time enrollment for certain students, establishing an alternative graduation rate calculation for virtual schools, providing virtual school state aid for credit deficient students and amending the age of initial eligibility for the tax credit for low income students scholarship program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-03-23 - House - House Final Action - Substitute passed as amended - Yea: 76 Nay: 46 (Y: 76 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Ousley was rejected - Yea: 50 Nay: 70 (Y: 50 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2022-03-22 - House - House Motion to Reconsider Adopted - Yea: 75 Nay: 45 (Y: 75 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Hoye was rejected - Yea: 44 Nay: 73 (Y: 44 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2022-03-22 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Hoye was rejected - Yea: 38 Nay: 81 (Y: 38 N: 81 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2022-03-22 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Ousley was adopted - Yea: 58 Nay: 54 (Y: 58 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-05-23SenateSenate Died in Senate Committee
2022-03-29SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Education
2022-03-28HouseHouse Engrossed on Wednesday, March 23, 2022
2022-03-28SenateSenate Received and Introduced
2022-03-23HouseHouse Final Action - Substitute passed as amended; Yea: 76 Nay: 46
2022-03-22HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed as amended
2022-03-22HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Ousley was rejected Yea: 50 Nay: 70
2022-03-22HouseHouse Motion to Reconsider Adopted Yea: 75 Nay: 45
2022-03-22HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Hoye was rejected Yea: 44 Nay: 73
2022-03-22HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Hoye
2022-03-22HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Hoye was rejected Yea: 38 Nay: 81
2022-03-22HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Hoye
2022-03-22HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Ousley was adopted Yea: 58 Nay: 54
2022-03-22HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Ousley
2022-03-22HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Owens was adopted
2022-03-22HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Owens
2022-03-22HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Tarwater was adopted
2022-03-22HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Tarwater
2022-03-22HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Winn was rejected
2022-03-22HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Winn
2022-03-22HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Hoffman was adopted
2022-03-22HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Hoffman
2022-03-22HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
2022-03-17HouseHouse Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on K-12 Education Budget
2022-03-07HouseHouse Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Referred to Committee on K-12 Education Budget
2022-02-23HouseHouse Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Appropriations
2022-02-17HouseHouse Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on K-12 Education Budget
2022-01-26HouseHouse Hearing: Wednesday, January 26, 2022, 3:30 PM Room 546-S
2022-01-20HouseHouse Referred to Committee on K-12 Education Budget
2022-01-20HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/hb2512/
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/hb2512_00_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/hb2512_01_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/hb2512_02_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/hb2512_03_0000.pdf
Amendmenthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/cr_2022_hb2512_h_3736.pdf
Amendmenthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/fa_2022_hb2512_h_3853.pdf
Amendmenthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/fa_2022_hb2512_h_3847.pdf
Amendmenthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/fa_2022_hb2512_h_3851.pdf
Amendmenthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/fa_2022_hb2512_h_3887.pdf
Amendmenthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/fa_2022_hb2512_h_3850.pdf
Amendmenthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/fa_2022_hb2512_h_3854.pdf
Amendmenthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/fa_2022_hb2512_h_3890.pdf
Supplementhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/fisc_note_hb2512_00_0000.pdf
Supplementhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/supp_note_hb2512_01_0000.pdf
Supplementhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/supp_note_hb2512_02_0000.pdf
Supplementhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/supp_note_hb2512_03_0000.pdf
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/vote_view/je_20220322140412_877215/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/vote_view/je_20220322141413_889124/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/vote_view/je_20220322141901_450233/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/vote_view/je_20220322145213_691702/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/vote_view/je_20220322143106_653279/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/vote_view/je_20220323102439_318998/

Bill Comments

feedback