KS HB2502 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designating the Abilene & Smoky Valley Railroad as the official state heritage railroad.
Title
Designating the Abilene & Smoky Valley Railroad as the official state heritage railroad.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | House | House Died in Committee |
2024-02-07 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, February 7, 2024, 1:30 PM Room 582-N |
2024-01-12 | House | House Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2024-01-12 | House | House Introduced |