KS HB2496 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2022 - 50% progression
Action: 2022-03-02 - Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Enacting the uniform family law arbitration act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enacting the uniform family law arbitration act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-02-23 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 121 Nay: 0 (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-03-02SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Judiciary
2022-03-01SenateSenate Received and Introduced
2022-02-23HouseHouse Final Action - Passed; Yea: 121 Nay: 0
2022-02-22HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Be passed
2022-02-10HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary
2022-01-26HouseHouse Hearing: Wednesday, January 26, 2022, 3:30 PM Room 582-N
2022-01-19HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Judiciary
2022-01-19HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback