KS HB2468 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning state of disaster emergencies, appointing the incident commander by the adjutant general for weather-related disasters, establishing coordinating duties of the division of emergency management and establishing the disaster contingency fund for use by the state finance council to match federal grants and funds to respond to such weather-related disaster.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning state of disaster emergencies, appointing the incident commander by the adjutant general for weather-related disasters, establishing coordinating duties of the division of emergency management and establishing the disaster contingency fund for use by the state finance council to match federal grants and funds to respond to such weather-related disaster.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-30HouseHouse Died in Committee
2024-01-24HouseHouse Hearing: Wednesday, January 24, 2024, 9:00 AM Room 112-N
2023-03-22HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Appropriations
2023-03-22HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback