KS HB2463 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amending the Kansas pesticide law's licensure requirements and the Kansas chemigation safety law's permittee requirements.
Title
Amending the Kansas pesticide law's licensure requirements and the Kansas chemigation safety law's permittee requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-26 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 125 Nay: 0 (Y: 125 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | Senate | Senate Died in Senate Committee |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, March 17, 2020, 8:30 AM Room 159-S |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2020-02-26 | House | House Engrossed on Wednesday, February 26, 2020 |
2020-02-26 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 125 Nay: 0 |
2020-02-25 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2020-02-25 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2020-02-20 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Agriculture |
2020-02-10 | House | House Hearing: Monday, February 10, 2020, 3:30 PM Room 582-N |
2020-02-05 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, February 5, 2020, 3:30 PM Room 582-N - CANCELED |
2020-01-22 | House | House Referred to Committee on Agriculture |
2020-01-22 | House | House Introduced |