KS HB2458 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - House Approved by Governor on Thursday, April 7, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - House Approved by Governor on Thursday, April 7, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Senate Substitute for HB 2458 by Committee on Transportation - Limiting the liability of optometrists and ophthalmologists who report information to the division of vehicles relating to a person's vision.
Title
Senate Substitute for HB 2458 by Committee on Transportation - Limiting the liability of optometrists and ophthalmologists who report information to the division of vehicles relating to a person's vision.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-29 - House - House Concurred with amendments - Yea: 121 Nay: 0 (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Substitute passed - Yea: 38 Nay: 1 (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed - Yea: 113 Nay: 0 (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Substitute passed - Yea: 38 Nay: 1 (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed - Yea: 113 Nay: 0 (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-25 | House | House Approved by Governor on Thursday, April 7, 2022 |
2022-03-30 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Wednesday, March 30, 2022 |
2022-03-29 | House | House Concurred with amendments; Yea: 121 Nay: 0 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Substitute passed; Yea: 38 Nay: 1 |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Transportation |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, March 8, 2022, 8:30 AM Room 546-S |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2022-02-17 | House | House Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 113 Nay: 0 |
2022-02-17 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2022-02-11 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Transportation |
2022-01-19 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, January 19, 2022, 1:30 PM Room 582-N |
2022-01-10 | House | House Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2022-01-10 | House | House Introduced |
2021-05-26 | House | House Prefiled for Introduction on Monday, December 13, 2021 |