KS HB2451 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding mandatory reporters of child abuse.
Title
Expanding mandatory reporters of child abuse.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-01 | House | House Died in Committee |
2016-01-21 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, January 27, 2016, 1:30 PM Room 152-S |
2016-01-13 | House | House Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice |
2016-01-13 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2015_16/measures/hb2451/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2015_16/measures/documents/hb2451_00_0000.pdf |