KS HB2447 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Substitute HB 2447 by Committee on Judiciary - Permitting testimony to be presented using a two-way electronic audio-video communication device during a preliminary hearing.
Title
Substitute HB 2447 by Committee on Judiciary - Permitting testimony to be presented using a two-way electronic audio-video communication device during a preliminary hearing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-21 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed - Yea: 120 Nay: 2 (Y: 120 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | Senate | Senate Died in Senate Committee |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2022-03-22 | House | House Engrossed on Tuesday, March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2022-03-21 | House | House Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed; Yea: 120 Nay: 2 |
2022-03-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed |
2022-03-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed |
2022-03-16 | House | House Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary |
2022-01-26 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, January 26, 2022, 3:30 PM Room 582-N |
2021-03-24 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, March 24, 2021, 3:30 PM Room 582-N |
2021-03-23 | House | House Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2021-03-23 | House | House Introduced |