KS HB2445 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for a property tax exemption for health clubs.
Title
Providing for a property tax exemption for health clubs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | House | House Died in Committee |
2021-03-23 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, March 23, 2021, 3:30 PM Room 346-S |
2021-03-19 | House | House Referred to Committee on Taxation |
2021-03-19 | House | House Introduced |