KS HB2431 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-27 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-27 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designating a bridge on United States highway 166 in Cowley county as the SGT Tyler A Juden memorial bridge.
Title
Designating a bridge on United States highway 166 in Cowley county as the SGT Tyler A Juden memorial bridge.
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Rhiley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-27 | House | House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507 |
2020-01-23 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Transportation |
2020-01-22 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, January 22, 2020, 1:30 PM Room 582-N |
2020-01-13 | House | House Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2020-01-13 | House | House Introduced |
2020-01-13 | House | House Prefiled for Introduction on Friday, December 20, 2019 |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/hb2431/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/hb2431_00_0000.pdf |