KS HB2399 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - House Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - House Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amortizing the state and school KPERS unfunded actuarial liability over a 24-year period and eliminating certain level-dollar employer contribution payments.
Title
Amortizing the state and school KPERS unfunded actuarial liability over a 24-year period and eliminating certain level-dollar employer contribution payments.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | House | House Died on Calendar |
2021-02-25 | House | House Committee Report without recommendation by |
2021-02-24 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, February 24, 2021, 3:30 PM Room 218-N |
2021-02-17 | House | House Referred to Committee on Insurance and Pensions |
2021-02-17 | House | House Introduced |