KS HB2391 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-15 - House Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-15 - House Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
House Substitute for HB 2391 by Committee on Elections - Amending the act establishing the governmental ethics commission, relating to campaign finance, establishing a five-year statute of limitations for bringing actions before the commission, limiting the commission's subpoena power, allowing respondents to transfer a hearing before the commission to a hearing officer under the office of administrative hearings.
Title
House Substitute for HB 2391 by Committee on Elections - Amending the act establishing the governmental ethics commission, relating to campaign finance, establishing a five-year statute of limitations for bringing actions before the commission, limiting the commission's subpoena power, allowing respondents to transfer a hearing before the commission to a hearing officer under the office of administrative hearings.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-15 | House | House Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Elections |
2023-03-01 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Rereferred to Committee on Elections |
2023-02-22 | House | House Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2023-02-22 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Elections |
2023-02-16 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, February 16, 2023, 3:30 PM Room 218-N |
2023-02-09 | House | House Referred to Committee on Elections |
2023-02-09 | House | House Introduced |