KS HB2389 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - House Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - House Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a notice to appear for unlawful possession of marijuana and defining complaint in the Kansas code of criminal procedure to include such notice to appear.
Title
Authorizing a notice to appear for unlawful possession of marijuana and defining complaint in the Kansas code of criminal procedure to include such notice to appear.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | House | House Died on Calendar |
2021-03-10 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations and re-referred to Committee of the Whole |
2021-03-05 | House | House Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-02-26 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary |
2021-02-23 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, February 23, 2021, 3:30 PM Room 582-N |
2021-02-12 | House | House Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2021-02-12 | House | House Introduced |