KS HB2382 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - Senate Died on Senate General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - Senate Died on Senate General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Senate Substitute for HB2382 by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice - Amendments to the juvenile justice system.
Title
Senate Substitute for HB2382 by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice - Amendments to the juvenile justice system.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-18 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 115 Nay: 6 (Y: 115 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-01 | Senate | Senate Died on Senate General Orders |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Ways and Means |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2015-03-18 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 115 Nay: 6 |
2015-03-18 | House | House Engrossed on Tuesday, March 17 , 2015 |
2015-03-17 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2015-03-17 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2015-03-11 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice |
2015-03-05 | House | House Hearing: Monday, March 09, 2015, 1:30 PM Room 152S |
2015-02-20 | House | House Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice |
2015-02-20 | House | House Introduced |