KS HB2333 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died on Senate General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died on Senate General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Audits of election results; voting machine requirements; timing of the canvass.
Title
Audits of election results; voting machine requirements; timing of the canvass.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-22 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 124 Nay: 0 (Y: 124 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Died on Senate General Orders |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Ethics, Elections and Local Government |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, January 24, 2018, 09:30 AM Room 142-S |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Calendar, Rereferred to Committee on Ethics, Elections and Local Government |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Ethics, Elections and Local Government |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 15, 2017, 09:30 AM Room 142-S |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Ethics, Elections and Local Government |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2017-02-22 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 124 Nay: 0 |
2017-02-22 | House | House Engrossed on Tuesday, February 21, 2017 |
2017-02-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2017-02-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2017-02-16 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Elections |
2017-02-13 | House | House Hearing: Monday, February 13, 2017, 01:30 PM Room 281-N |
2017-02-09 | House | House Referred to Committee on Elections |
2017-02-09 | House | House Introduced |