KS HB2322 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-24 - House Approved by Governor on Tuesday, April 18, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-24 - House Approved by Governor on Tuesday, April 18, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revising the definition of "children with disabilities" for purposes of providing special education to replace emotional disturbance with emotional disability.
Title
Revising the definition of "children with disabilities" for purposes of providing special education to replace emotional disturbance with emotional disability.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-06 - House - House Concurred with amendments in conference - Yea: 120 Nay: 2 (Y: 120 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 120 Nay: 2 (Y: 120 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 120 Nay: 2 (Y: 120 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-24 | House | House Approved by Governor on Tuesday, April 18, 2023 |
2023-04-24 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 14, 2023 |
2023-04-06 | House | House Concurred with amendments in conference; Yea: 120 Nay: 2 |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Senate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Baumgardner, Senator Erickson and Senator Sykes appointed as conferees |
2023-03-29 | House | House Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Thomas , Representative Estes and Representative Stogsdill as conferees |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Baumgardner was adopted |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Baumgardner |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Education |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, March 7, 2023, 1:30 PM Room 144-S |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Education |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2023-02-23 | House | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 120 Nay: 2 |
2023-02-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2023-02-20 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Education |
2023-02-16 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, February 16, 2023, 1:30 PM Room 218-N |
2023-02-07 | House | House Referred to Committee on Education |
2023-02-07 | House | House Introduced |