KS HB2283 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting certain victims from being considered an aggressor or participant as a mitigating factor when considering a departure sentence.
Title
Exempting certain victims from being considered an aggressor or participant as a mitigating factor when considering a departure sentence.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | House | House Died in Committee |
2019-02-22 | House | House Hearing: Friday, February 22, 2019, 1:30 PM Room 152-S |
2019-02-13 | House | House Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice |
2019-02-13 | House | House Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/hb2283/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/hb2283_00_0000.pdf |