KS HB2282 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing the state treasurer to enter into agreements with eligible applicants to guarantee agricultural loans up to 80% and creating a committee to review and approve applications for such guaranteed loans.
Title
Allowing the state treasurer to enter into agreements with eligible applicants to guarantee agricultural loans up to 80% and creating a committee to review and approve applications for such guaranteed loans.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | House | House Died in Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, February 17, 2021, 9:00 AM Room 218-N |
2021-02-09 | House | House Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Rural Development |
2021-02-09 | House | House Introduced |