KS HB2280 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring a person convicted of driving under the influence to pay child support for any child of a person killed during the offense giving rise to such conviction.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requiring a person convicted of driving under the influence to pay child support for any child of a person killed during the offense giving rise to such conviction.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-30HouseHouse Died in Committee
2023-02-08HouseHouse Hearing: Wednesday, February 8, 2023, 1:30 PM Room 546-S
2023-02-02HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
2023-02-02HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback