KS HB2280 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 30-0)
Status: Failed on May 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-30 - Senate Died in Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

School districts; establishing celebrate freedom week and related curriculum.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School districts; establishing celebrate freedom week and related curriculum.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-03-01 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 95 Nay: 25 (Y: 95 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-05-30SenateSenate Died in Senate Committee
2013-03-07SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Education
2013-03-06SenateSenate Received and Introduced
2013-03-06HouseHouse Engrossed on Friday, 01 March 2013
2013-03-01HouseHouse Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 95 Nay: 25
2013-03-01HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
2013-03-01HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Lusk was rejected
2013-03-01HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Lusk
2013-03-01HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2013-02-27HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by
2013-02-22HouseHouse Hearing: Monday, February 25, 2013, 1:30 PM Room 112-N
2013-02-13HouseHouse Hearing: Friday, February 22, 2013, 10:30 PM Room 212 B-N
2013-02-08HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Education
2013-02-08HouseHouse Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback